RI H7294 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the "Neil Fachon Terminally Ill Patient's Right To Try Act of 2018," which establishes the conditions for the use of experimental treatments for terminally ill patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treatment For Patients With Terminal Illness--the Neil Fachon Terminally Ill Patients' Right To Try Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/16/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback