RI H7289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates restricted receipt account for all 911 funds and requires these funds to be used solely for operation of the 911 system.
Title
911 Emergency Telephone Number Act--prepaid Wireless E-911 Charge Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018) |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7289.pdf |