RI H7287 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Compulsory Attendance (would Prohibit Schools From Considering A Students Truancy Or Absenteeism As A Basis For Using An Out-of-school Suspension As A Disciplinary Action.)
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Compulsory Attendance (would Prohibit Schools From Considering A Students Truancy Or Absenteeism As A Basis For Using An Out-of-school Suspension As A Disciplinary Action.)
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-29 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-05-24 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/29/2012) | |
2012-05-23 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-05-18 | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-02-29 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on House Calendar (02/29/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-02-10 | Scheduled for consideration (02/15/2012) | |
2012-02-08 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2012) | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7287.pdf |