RI H7281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals and replaces Richmond-Carolina Fire District charter.
Title
Relating To The Richmond-carolina Fire District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2018-06-13 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2018) |
2018-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |