RI H7281 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires mortgagees, upon initiating a foreclosure, to file a copy of the notice with the municipal clerk, to appoint an agent for service of process, and to maintain the property in the event it becomes vacant during the foreclosure process.
Title
Mortgage And Foreclosure Sale
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2016) |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7281.pdf |