RI H7281 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - Procedure Generally - Levy And Sale On Execution (would Grant The Homestead Exemption Provided By Rhode Island Law To Manufactured Homes.)
Title
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - Procedure Generally - Levy And Sale On Execution (would Grant The Homestead Exemption Provided By Rhode Island Law To Manufactured Homes.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Russell Jackson [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Rep. Peter Petrarca [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2012) | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7281.pdf |