RI H7280 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows new applicants who apply after August 1, 2020, for net-metering systems and community remote-net-metering systems and any person that is a renewable self-generator to increase the maximum mega wattage from 30 MW to megawatts (60 MW).
Title
Net Metering
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2020) |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7280.pdf |