RI H7276 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING AND MORTGAGE FINANCE CORPORATION - Establishes a revolving fund to assist first-time home buyers and veterans to purchase a home in Rhode Island by issuing grants of up to forty thousand dollars ($40,000).
Title
Establishes a revolving fund to assist first-time home buyers and veterans to purchase a home in Rhode Island by issuing grants of up to forty thousand dollars ($40,000).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING AND MORTGAGE FINANCE CORPORATION
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING AND MORTGAGE FINANCE CORPORATION
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7276.pdf |