RI H7271 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island Early Educator Investment Act to develop and implement strategies to improve the compensation of early educators.
Title
Rhode Island Early Educator Investment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2020) |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7271.pdf |