RI H7268 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals ยง 11-12-1 of the general laws that prohibits engaging in a duel with a dangerous weapon.
Title
Dueling And Fighting
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7268.pdf |