RI H7264 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it a felony to commit an assault on a person with developmental disabilities.
Title
Assaults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018) |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7264.pdf |