RI H7263 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the superior court or the family court in reviewing sex offender level determination by the sex offender board of review, to raise or lower the offender's community notification level.
Title
Sexual Offender Registration And Community Notification
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7263.pdf |