RI H7257 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits dogs in outdoor dining areas of restaurants under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanitation In Food Establishments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-20HouseSigned by Governor
2016-07-18HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
2016-03-31SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2016-03-23HouseHouse read and passed
2016-03-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/23/2016)
2016-03-16HouseCommittee recommends passage
2016-03-11HouseScheduled for consideration (03/16/2016)
2016-02-09HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-02-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2016)
2016-01-20HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback