RI H7257 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Small Loan Lenders (would Repeal Sections Of The General Laws Allowing Deferred Deposit Providers, Also Known As Payday Lenders)
Title
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Small Loan Lenders (would Repeal Sections Of The General Laws Allowing Deferred Deposit Providers, Also Known As Payday Lenders)
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. Michael Tarro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-20 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2012) | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7257.pdf |