RI H7253 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting Date Of The Special Joint Commission To Study The Education Of Children With Autism In The State Of Rhode Island (extends The Reporting Date From January 28, 2010, To January 26, 2011, And Said Commission Shall Expire On June 28, 2011)
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting Date Of The Special Joint Commission To Study The Education Of Children With Autism In The State Of Rhode Island (extends The Reporting Date From January 28, 2010, To January 26, 2011, And Said Commission Shall Expire On June 28, 2011)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-02 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-06-02 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Senate Constitutional and Regulatory Issues | |
2010-01-27 | House read and passed |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7253.pdf |