RI H7231 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an accident compensation fund to provide payments and benefits to those injured by uninsured motorists, to be administered by the automobile accident compensation corporation.
Title
Rhode Island Automobile Accident Compensation Corporation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/13/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7231.pdf |