RI H7229 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS AGRICULTURAL EQUIPMENT RIGHT TO REPAIR ACT - Provides that original equipment manufacturers, implemented by/with surrogate distributors, of agricultural equipment, provide to independent service providers repair information and tools to maintain and repair electronics-enabled agricultural equipment.
Title
Provides that original equipment manufacturers, implemented by/with surrogate distributors, of agricultural equipment, provide to independent service providers repair information and tools to maintain and repair electronics-enabled agricultural equipment.
Sponsors
Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2024) |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Commercial Law
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS AGRICULTURAL EQUIPMENT RIGHT TO REPAIR ACT
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS AGRICULTURAL EQUIPMENT RIGHT TO REPAIR ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7229.pdf |