RI H7224 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any women's business enterprise that is certified under the Federal Small Business Act would be deemed certified by the department of administration as a women's business enterprise.
Title
Relating To Public Property And Works-minority Business Enterprise
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7224.pdf |