RI H7221 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approval and funding of drug awareness programs for minors placed with the department of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals.
Title
The Uniformed Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018) |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7221.pdf |