RI H7219 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES -- HIV/AIDS - Repeals the required HIV testing for an individual convicted under chapter 34.1 of title 11 and allows the option for HIV testing for any person convicted under this chapter.
Title
Repeals the required HIV testing for an individual convicted under chapter 34.1 of title 11 and allows the option for HIV testing for any person convicted under this chapter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Health And Safety
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES -- HIV/AIDS
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES -- HIV/AIDS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7219.pdf |