RI H7219 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the lobbying reform act to apply to persons who lobby municipal government executives and legislative bodies, as well as local fire districts.
Title
The Rhode Island Lobbying Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7219.pdf |