RI H7219 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a revolving fund to provide low interest loans and grants to support the installation of solar energy panels.
Title
Solar Industry Economic Investment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7219.pdf |