RI H7219 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require those persons who are contract employees of a private or public school department, and individuals hired by a third party vendor who has contracted with the private or public school department to undergo a national criminal background check.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Donald Lally [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/27/2014) |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-03-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2014) |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |