RI H7203 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits a recipient of direct cash assistance on electronic benefit cards from utilizing the card to purchase certain items and sanctions businesses accepting the cards for non-authorized products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Assistance Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-19HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2016-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016)
2016-06-14SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2016-06-10SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2016)
2016-03-31SenateReferred to Senate Finance
2016-03-17HouseHouse read and passed
2016-03-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/17/2016)
2016-03-09HouseCommittee recommends passage
2016-03-07HouseScheduled for consideration (03/09/2016)
2016-02-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2016)
2016-01-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback