RI H7201 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a procedure for homeowners to submit to a municipal zoning board of review or municipal official or agency for a review to determine whether or not a proposed use under this chapter requires a special use permit.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | House read and passed |
2022-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/26/2022) |
2022-05-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/16/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |