RI H7194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires driver's instruction courses and tests to include instruction information on driver's responsible conduct and rights during a traffic stop.
Title
Driver Education Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-05-22 | House | House read and passed |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2018) |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Meeting postponed (03/21/2018) |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |