RI H7186 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that nomination papers for certain candidates for citywide nonpartisan office in the city of Woonsocket would require at least one hundred (100) signatures.
Title
Relating To Elections-nomination Of Party And Independent Candidates-city Of Woonsocket
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-06-12 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2018) |
2018-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018) |
2018-03-06 | House | Meeting postponed (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |