RI H7181 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exclude from RI state taxation pension benefits that originate in and were subject to taxation in another state
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2014) |
2014-05-06 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/07/2014) |
2014-05-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-04-15 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-04-01 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/02/2014) |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7181.pdf |