RI H7174 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- RHODE ISLAND FAIR HOUSING PRACTICES ACT - Prohibits landlords from inquiring about an applicant's prior incarceration and from discriminating against those who have been released from prison.
Title
Prohibits landlords from inquiring about an applicant's prior incarceration and from discriminating against those who have been released from prison.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] | Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7174.pdf |