RI H7165 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Licensing Of Genetic Counselors (would Provide A Statutory Framework For The Licensing And Regulations Of Genetic Counselors)
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Licensing Of Genetic Counselors (would Provide A Statutory Framework For The Licensing And Regulations Of Genetic Counselors)
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Rice [?] | Rep. Michael Rice [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-09 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-02 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-02 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-19 | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services | |
2010-05-18 | House passed Sub A | |
2010-05-11 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-11 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7165.pdf |