RI H7162 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- RESIDENTIAL LANDLORD AND TENANT ACT - Permits those other residents of a residential dwelling unit to extend the term of the rental agreement for a period not to exceed three (3) months after the death of the lessee.
Title
Permits those other residents of a residential dwelling unit to extend the term of the rental agreement for a period not to exceed three (3) months after the death of the lessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-06-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-06-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2024) |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |