RI H7161 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/02/2022)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/02/2022)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 -- THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Sets forth criteria for suspending students in sixth grade and above and grades pre-school through fifth and mandates school superintendents file annual reports relating to disproportionate disciplinary impact based upon race, ethnicity, or disability.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Nathan Biah [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/02/2022) |
2022-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7161.pdf |