RI H7161 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (four Year Terms And Term Limits For Senators And Representatives)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (four Year Terms And Term Limits For Senators And Representatives)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Meeting postponed (03/21/2018) |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7161.pdf |