RI H7161 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurance policies to provide coverage for the use of telecommunication services rendered to subscribers who reside on islands located within the state that are not connected to the mainland by any bridge or other structure.
Title
Relating To Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7161.pdf |