RI H7157 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Encourages the public schools of this state, beginning in kindergarten and continuing through and including grade 12, to use best efforts annually provide access to every student to at least one field trip to a nature preserve, reserve, or conservatory.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Curriculum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-19HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-13HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/13/2018)
2018-01-31HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-01-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2018)
2018-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback