RI H7150 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the condominium lien foreclosure law to allow for publication of legal advertisements in any public newspaper published daily in the municipality where the condominium unit is located
Title
Condominium Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2014) |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7150.pdf |