RI H7143 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-12 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-12 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
or lay-off of teachers in the event of a fiscal exigency or program reorganization
Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Referred to Senate Labor | |
2010-05-12 | House passed Sub A | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-06 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7143.pdf |