RI H7142 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds post-traumatic stress disorder as a "debilitating medical condition" and accelerates an approved medical marijuana application for hospice care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-12HouseSigned by Governor
2016-07-07HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-16SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2016-06-16SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2016)
2016-06-16HouseHouse read and passed
2016-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/16/2016)
2016-05-24HouseCommittee recommends passage
2016-05-20HouseScheduled for consideration (05/24/2016)
2016-04-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-04-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2016)
2016-01-13HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback