RI H7141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that past criminal misdemeanors and felonies for possession of marijuana not be used against a person from entering the cannabis industry or any government assistance programs.
Title
The Rhode Island Marijuana Expungement Act Of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2020) |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7141.pdf |