RI H7141 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows social gaming in private residences and in public taverns or private clubs so long as the gambling is incidental to a bona fide social relationship between the participants and only participants receive anything of value.
Title
Gambling And Lotteries
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2016) |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7141.pdf |