RI H7141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow a business engaged in qualifying sales and located in an existing structure in which a developer or property owner invests in the complete renovation located in a MED zone in the town of West Warwick to receive MED zone tax credits
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014) |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7141.pdf |