RI H7138 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry - Dogs (would Provide Guidelines & Penalties For Any Person That Keeps A Dog Outside Tethered, Penned, Caged, Fenced Or Otherwise Confined Without Adequate Shelter From The Elements & Would Add Definitions...)
Title
An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry - Dogs (would Provide Guidelines & Penalties For Any Person That Keeps A Dog Outside Tethered, Penned, Caged, Fenced Or Otherwise Confined Without Adequate Shelter From The Elements & Would Add Definitions...)
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Peter Petrarca [D] |
Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Withdrawn at sponsor's request | |
2012-02-09 | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/14/2012) | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7138.pdf |