RI H7136 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires judicial nominating commission to include certain questions on application, requires commission to retain data relative to race and gender and classifies applicant’s information as public records with an opt out provision.
Title
Courts -- Judicial Selection
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Mario Mendez [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2020) |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7136.pdf |