RI H7134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the public utilities commission to implement a purchase of receivables program where the electric distribution company purchases the receivables of a nonregulated power producer at a discount rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Generation Service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-19HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-02-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018)
2018-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback