RI H7130 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the town of New Shoreham from the jurisdiction of the division of public utilities and carriers for purposes of regulating transportation network companies.
Title
Transportation Network Company Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/06/2018) |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7130.pdf |