RI H7123 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Require that a written notice be given to a person who has been referred for testing for Lyme disease and would also provide physicians with immunity from civil liability for the provision of the written notice, absent gross negligence
Title
Lyme Disease Diagnosis And Treatment
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A as amended |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-01-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/22/2014) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |