RI H7110 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedure -- Search Warrants (would Require Search Warrants Be Issued, Subject To Established Exceptions, Prior To Obtaining Information Contained In Portable Electronic Devices.)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedure -- Search Warrants (would Require Search Warrants Be Issued, Subject To Established Exceptions, Prior To Obtaining Information Contained In Portable Electronic Devices.)
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-07 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-06-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2012) | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-04-26 | House read and passed | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on House Calendar (04/26/2012) | |
2012-04-24 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-04-19 | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2012) | |
2012-03-13 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2012) | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7110.pdf |