RI H7102 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the manufacturing, importation, sale, shipment, delivery, possession, or transfer of any firearm that is undetectable by metal detectors commonly used at airports and public buildings including 3D printed firearms as defined herein.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - Passage of amendment ruling of the chair (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment (Y: 9 N: 56 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23SenateSigned by Governor
2020-06-17SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2020-06-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2020)
2020-06-10HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
2020-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/10/2020)
2020-03-12HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2020-03-11SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/11/2020)
2020-02-13HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2020-02-04HousePlaced on House Calendar (02/13/2020)
2020-01-29HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2020-01-28HouseProposed Substitute
2020-01-28HouseScheduled for consideration (01/29/2020)
2020-01-28HouseMeeting postponed (01/28/2020)
2020-01-28HouseMeeting postponed (01/28/2020)
2020-01-24HouseProposed Substitute
2020-01-24HouseScheduled for consideration
2020-01-22HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2020-01-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/22/2020)
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback