RI H7098 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes a fee of fifty dollars ($50.00) for the registration of a camping recreational vehicle.
Title
Registration Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7098.pdf |