RI H7096 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - Senate passed Sub B
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - Senate passed Sub B
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers who obtain a rating of “highly effective” or the equivalent thereof would be evaluated not more than once every 4 yrs, and that teachers who obtain a rating of “effective” or the equivalent thereof would be evaluated not more than 3 yrs
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2014-05-27 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/27/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2014) |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |